Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Cristóbal Abril González

Auxiliary Bishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1972 Born
10 Feb 199623.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tunja, Colombia
16 Apr 201643.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
16 Apr 201643.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena
4 Jun 201643.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Putia in Byzacena

MicroData Summary for Jaime Cristóbal Abril González
Bishop Jaime Cristóbal Abril González (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Nueva Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Espino

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Nueva Pamplona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 17 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 3 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast