Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augusto Trujillo Arango

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tunja


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1922BornSanta Rosa de Cabal
6 Aug 194523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Manizales, Colombia
25 Apr 195734.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manizales, Colombia
25 Apr 195734.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisyrus
9 Jun 195734.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nisyrus
31 Mar 196037.7AppointedBishop of Jericó, Colombia
20 Feb 197047.5AppointedArchbishop of Tunja, Colombia
2 Feb 199875.5RetiredArchbishop of Tunja, Colombia
24 Feb 200784.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tunja, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Augusto Trujillo Arango:
Archbishop Augusto Trujillo Arango (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tunja

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 49.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013