Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Uribe Urdaneta

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cali, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1918Born
8 Nov 194223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
19 Dec 195335.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manizales, Colombia
19 Dec 195335.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
3 May 195435.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
18 Mar 195738.2AppointedBishop of Sonsón, Colombia
13 Jul 196041.5AppointedBishop of Cali, Colombia
20 Jun 196445.5AppointedArchbishop of Cali, Colombia
7 Feb 198566.1ResignedArchbishop of Cali, Colombia
13 Dec 198566.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cali, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alberto Uribe Urdaneta
Archbishop Alberto Uribe Urdaneta (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cali

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast