Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop JuliŠn Mendoza Guerrero

Deceased

Bishop of Buga, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1914Born
28 Oct 193925.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jan 196752.7AppointedBishop of Buga, Colombia
5 Mar 196752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Buga, Colombia
4 Aug 198470.3DiedBishop of Buga, Colombia

MicroData Summary for JuliŠn Mendoza Guerrero
Bishop JuliŠn Mendoza Guerrero (born , died ) Bishop of Buga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCartago

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018