Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Franco Arango

Deceased

Bishop of Duitama, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1914Born
20 Nov 193824.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 196450.2AppointedBishop of Duitama, Colombia
15 Aug 196450.4Ordained BishopBishop of Duitama, Colombia
16 Sep 198066.5DiedBishop of Duitama, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Julio Franco Arango
Bishop Julio Franco Arango (born , died ) Bishop of Duitama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTamesis

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018