Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arturo Duque Villegas

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Manizales, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1899Born
20 Mar 192626.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 194949.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ibagué, Colombia
7 May 194949.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vatarba
7 Aug 194949.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vatarba
17 Mar 195757.3AppointedBishop of Ibagué, Colombia
7 Jul 195959.6AppointedArchbishop of Manizales, Colombia
22 May 197575.4RetiredArchbishop of Manizales, Colombia
26 Jul 197777.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Manizales, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Arturo Duque Villegas
Archbishop Arturo Duque Villegas (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manizales

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbejorral

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jun 2017