Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ibagué

Archidioecesis Ibaguensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Flavio Calle Zapata, Archbishop
  • Orlando Roa Barbosa, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 December 1974
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 6,044 (2,334 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisdeibague.org/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Arzobispal, Calle 10, No 2-58, Ibague, Tolima, Colombia
  • Telephone: (82)661-680
  • Fax: 632.681

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ibagué
20 May 1900ErectedDiocese of Tolima (suppressed) Diocese of Garzón (erected)
Diocese of Ibagué (erected)
18 March 1957Territory LostDiocese of Ibagué Diocese of Espinal (erected)
Archdiocese of Ibagué
14 December 1974ElevatedDiocese of Ibagué Archdiocese of Ibagué
8 July 1989Territory LostArchdiocese of Ibagué Diocese of Líbano-Honda (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ibagué
1950709,580710,58099.9%89181076,6313525061ap1951
1966580,000600,00096.7%93271204,8334523846ap1967
1970780,000780,000100.0%84201047,5003029950ap1971
Archdiocese of Ibagué
1976750,000800,00093.8%7615918,2412728056ap1977
1980771,000822,00093.8%7516918,4723423058ap1981
1990383,500415,76392.2%5512675,7231813138ap1991
1999489,579543,97790.0%7918975,0472514646ap2000
2000485,747539,71990.0%7816945,1672813748ap2001
2001485,355539,28490.0%82181004,8533114253ap2002
2002489,400547,00489.5%8117984,993123114154ap2003
2003504,611560,67990.0%89161054,805122314354ap2004
2004510,300567,00090.0%7217895,733122915054ap2005
2006504,310560,34490.0%83181014,993123216455ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014