Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Agustín Valbuena Jáuregui

Bishop Emeritus of Valledupar, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1927 Born
20 Nov 194922.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 197750.3AppointedBishop of Valledupar, Colombia
25 Oct 197750.4Ordained BishopBishop of Valledupar, Colombia
10 Jun 200376.0RetiredBishop of Valledupar, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Agustín Valbuena Jáuregui
Bishop José Agustín Valbuena Jáuregui (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Valledupar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFacatativá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valledupar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018