Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabián Marulanda López

Bishop Emeritus of Florencia, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1933 Born
20 Nov 196026.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 198652.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ibagué, Colombia
15 Jul 198652.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pederodiana
15 Aug 198652.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pederodiana
22 Dec 198955.9AppointedBishop of Florencia, Colombia
19 Jul 200268.5ResignedBishop of Florencia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Fabián Marulanda López
Bishop Fabián Marulanda López (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Florencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarulanda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Florencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018