Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Joaquín Flórez Hernández

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ibagué, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1916Born
21 Jul 194023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
7 Mar 195538.3AppointedBishop of Duitama, Colombia
24 Apr 195538.4Ordained BishopBishop of Duitama, Colombia
17 Mar 196447.3AppointedBishop of Ibagué, Colombia
14 Dec 197458.0AppointedArchbishop of Ibagué, Colombia
25 Mar 199376.3RetiredArchbishop of Ibagué, Colombia
22 Jun 199679.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ibagué, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Joaquín Flórez Hernández
Archbishop José Joaquín Flórez Hernández (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ibagué

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOnzaga

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 25 Apr 2020

Quantcast