Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Flavio Calle Zapata

Archbishop Emeritus of Ibagué, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1944 Born
22 Aug 196824.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Feb 198944.9AppointedPrelate of Alto Sinú, Colombia
16 Mar 198945.0Ordained BishopPrelate of Alto Sinú, Colombia
16 Feb 199348.9AppointedBishop of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
10 Jan 200358.8AppointedArchbishop of Ibagué, Colombia
19 Mar 201975.0RetiredArchbishop of Ibagué, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Flavio Calle Zapata
Archbishop Flavio Calle Zapata (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ibagué

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Andrés
Ordained BishopSanta Rosa de Osos, Diocese of Santa Rosa de Osos

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ibagué.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,178
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast