Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Montelibano

Dioecesis Monslibanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 29 December 1998
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cartagena
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 11,000 (4,248 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Calle 17 N. 6-39, Montelibano [Cordoba], Colombia
  • Telephone: (947)72.20.15
  • Fax: 72.24.50

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sinú
1924ErectedArchdiocese of Cartagena Prefecture Apostolic of Sinú (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Sinú-San Jorge
12 January 1931Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Sinú Prefecture Apostolic of Sinú-San Jorge
Vicariate Apostolic of San Jorge
10 March 1950ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Sinú-San Jorge Vicariate Apostolic of San Jorge
20 November 1954Territory LostArchdiocese of Cartagena
Vicariate Apostolic of San Jorge
Diocese of Montería (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Alto Sinú
25 April 1969ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of San Jorge Territorial Prelature of Alto Sinú
Diocese of Montelibano
29 December 1998ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Alto Sinú Diocese of Montelibano

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of San Jorge
195097,92197,99599.9%17175,760509ap1951
1966280,000295,00094.9%1135466,08611427ap1967
Territorial Prelature of Alto Sinú
196795,876.0%13ap1971
1976132,000135,00097.8%491310,15313247ap1977
1980140,000141,80098.7%471112,72711278ap1981
1987217,000222,00097.7%881613,56293710ap1991
Diocese of Montelibano
1999205,806272,00075.7%234277,62244715ap2000
2000205,806272,00075.7%254297,09644715ap2001
2001206,700273,00075.7%274316,66744715ap2002
2002207,000276,00075.0%254297,13744715ap2003
2003205,000274,00074.8%244287,32144616ap2004
2004225,000243,00092.6%233268,65335916ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.7, 12 Feb 2013; data: 18 Feb 2013