Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Sánchez Peña, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Alto Sinú, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Castro di Sardegna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1913Born
5 Dec 193724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
28 Jul 196956.3AppointedPrelate of Alto Sinú, Colombia
28 Jul 196956.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castro di Sardegna
5 Oct 196956.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castro di Sardegna
16 Feb 198975.9RetiredPrelate of Alto Sinú, Colombia
11 Jul 199784.3DiedPrelate Emeritus of Alto Sinú, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Sánchez Peña
Bishop Alfonso Sánchez Peña C.M.F. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Alto Sinú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotà, Archdiocese of Bogotá
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogotà, Archdiocese of Bogotá

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast