Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos Barreto Barreto

Bishop of Quibdó


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1968 BornEl Guamo
30 Jan 199324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Espinal, Colombia
30 Jan 201344.1AppointedBishop of Quibdó, Colombia
9 Mar 201344.2Ordained BishopBishop of Quibdó, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Barreto Barreto:
Bishop Juan Carlos Barreto Barreto (born ) Bishop of Quibdó

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quibdó.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 31 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 8 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,662

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013