Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar José Vélez Isaza, C.M.F.

Bishop of Valledupar, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1954 Born
12 Dec 197521.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
10 Jun 200348.5AppointedBishop of Valledupar, Colombia
19 Jul 200348.7Ordained BishopBishop of Valledupar, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Oscar José Vélez Isaza
Bishop Oscar José Vélez Isaza C.M.F. (born ) Bishop of Valledupar

EventPlace
Birth PlacePensilvania

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valledupar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast