Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Aníbal Salazar Gómez

Bishop of La Dorada-Guaduas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1942 BornEl Santuario
19 Nov 196624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sonsón, Colombia
28 Oct 199553.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
28 Oct 199553.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Voncariana
2 Dec 199553.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Voncariana
5 Jun 199956.7AppointedBishop of La Dorada-Guaduas, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Oscar Aníbal Salazar Gómez:
Bishop Oscar Aníbal Salazar Gómez (born ) Bishop of La Dorada-Guaduas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Dorada-Guaduas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,704
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013