Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquín Garcia Benitez, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Medellín

Titular Archbishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1883BornBucaramanga
18 Dec 190926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
15 Sep 191734.4AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
17 Feb 191834.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
14 May 194259.1AppointedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
28 Nov 195774.6RetiredArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
28 Nov 195774.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
1 Sep 195875.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Garcia Benitez:
Archbishop Joaquín Garcia Benitez C.I.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Medellín

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013