Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Vicente Arenas y Rueda

Deceased

Bishop of Socorro, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1862Born
22 Feb 188826.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Socorro, Colombia
25 Feb 188826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Socorro, Colombia
28 May 191452.3AppointedBishop of Socorro, Colombia
2 Aug 191452.5Ordained BishopBishop of Socorro, Colombia
19 Jul 192260.5DiedBishop of Socorro, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Vicente Arenas y Rueda
Bishop Antonio Vicente Arenas y Rueda (born , died ) Bishop of Socorro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZapatoca

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 42
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018