Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esteban Rojas Tobar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Garzón, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Modra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1859Born
23 Sep 188223.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Mar 188324.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 189536.1AppointedBishop of Tolima, Colombia
21 Apr 189536.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tolima, Colombia
20 May 190041.3AppointedBishop of Garzón, Colombia
21 Jul 192263.5ResignedBishop of Garzón, Colombia
21 Jul 192263.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Modra
28 Jul 193374.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Garzón, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Esteban Rojas Tobar (VIAF: 20913309)
Bishop Esteban Rojas Tobar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Garzón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Hato, Diocese of Popayán
Ordained BishopCollege Pio Latino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 283, and Page 558
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017