Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Nacianceno Hoyos Yarza

Deceased

Bishop of Manizales, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1849Born
1 Dec 187223.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 190152.0AppointedBishop of Manizales, Colombia
29 Jun 190252.5Ordained BishopBishop of Manizales, Colombia
25 Oct 192171.9DiedBishop of Manizales, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Nacianceno Hoyos Yarza
Bishop Gregorio Nacianceno Hoyos Yarza (born , died ) Bishop of Manizales

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranada

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 363
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,902, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast