Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Botero González

Deceased

Bishop of Pasto, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1884Born
1 Nov 190723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
30 Aug 194763.4AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
26 Oct 194763.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pasto, Colombia
21 Aug 196177.4DiedBishop of Pasto, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Emilio Botero González
Bishop Emilio Botero González (born , died ) Bishop of Pasto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarinilla

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018