Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Madrid Merlano

Archbishop of Nueva Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1946 BornCartagena
29 Jun 197124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Istmina, Colombia
21 May 198841.5AppointedPrelate of Tibú, Colombia
3 Jul 198841.6Ordained BishopPrelate of Tibú, Colombia
19 Apr 199548.4AppointedBishop of Cartago, Colombia
30 Mar 201063.4AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
22 May 201063.5InstalledArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Madrid Merlano:
Archbishop Luis Madrid Merlano (born ) Archbishop of Nueva Pamplona

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Nueva Pamplona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,917

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015