Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos José Ruiseco Vieira

Archbishop Emeritus of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1935 BornMedellín
6 Jan 196024.2Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 197136.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
10 Dec 197136.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Febiana
13 Feb 197236.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Febiana
28 Mar 197741.4AppointedBishop of Montería, Colombia
23 Sep 198347.9AppointedArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia
24 Oct 200570.0ResignedArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Carlos José Ruiseco Vieira:
Archbishop Carlos José Ruiseco Vieira (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cartagena

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cartagena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Aug 2014