Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo Eugenio Puccini Banfi

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1935 BornBarranquilla
27 Aug 196731.8Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
9 Dec 197742.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
9 Dec 197742.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Oppidum Consilinum
18 Feb 197842.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oppidum Consilinum
4 Dec 198752.1AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Hugo Eugenio Puccini Banfi:
Bishop Hugo Eugenio Puccini Banfi (born ) Bishop of Santa Marta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Marta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013