Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Germán Villa Gaviria, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Barranquilla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1911BornSopetrán
7 Jul 193524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
10 Nov 195645.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia
10 Nov 195645.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamdia
10 Feb 195745.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamdia
3 Feb 195947.8AppointedBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
19 Mar 195947.9InstalledBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
25 Apr 196958.0AppointedArchbishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
11 May 198776.1RetiredArchbishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
18 Jun 199281.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Barranquilla, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Germán Villa Gaviria:
Archbishop Germán Villa Gaviria C.I.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Barranquilla

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013