Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Roberto Vicentini

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1878Born
3 May 192142.8AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
19 May 192142.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Helenopolis in Palaestina
19 May 192142.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Helenopolis in Palaestina
18 May 192243.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
28 Oct 192446.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
14 Dec 192547.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
10 Oct 195375.2DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Roberto Vicentini
Patriarch Roberto Vicentini (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceL'Aquila, Archdiocese of L’Aquila, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 35
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 99, and Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast