Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tibú

Dioecesis Tibuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 29 December 1998
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nueva Pamplona
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 7,825 (3,022 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Av. 9 n. 2-12, Tibu, Norte de Santander, Colombia
  • Telephone: (975) 66-3289
  • Fax: 66-3688

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Bertrania en el Catatumbo
1 August 1951ErectedDiocese of Nueva Pamplona Territorial Prelature of Bertrania en el Catatumbo (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Tibú
16 November 1983Name ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Bertrania en el Catatumbo Territorial Prelature of Tibú
Diocese of Tibú
29 December 1998ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Tibú Diocese of Tibú

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Bertrania en el Catatumbo
195625,00025,000100.0%10102,50064ap1967
196835,86637,39095.9%1116ap1971
1976155,040160,00096.9%26819,380747ap1977
1980175,500195,00090.0%841214,625579ap1981
Territorial Prelature of Tibú
1990206,000216,00095.4%1051513,733173613ap1991
Diocese of Tibú
1999195,000199,00098.0%164209,750153316ap2000
2000195,000199,00098.0%1521711,470123316ap2001
2001195,000199,00098.0%192219,285123316ap2002
2002180,000190,00094.7%163199,473143014ap2003
2003180,000190,00094.7%184228,181153014ap2004
2004180,000190,00094.7%164209,000143414ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.7, 12 Feb 2013; data: 18 Feb 2013