Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Leonardo Gómez Serna, O.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Magangué, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1942 Born
22 Aug 196825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Oct 198037.9AppointedPrelate of Bertrania en el Catatumbo, Colombia
15 Apr 198542.4AppointedPrelate of Tibú, Colombia
9 Jul 198542.6Ordained BishopPrelate of Tibú, Colombia
6 Mar 198643.3AppointedBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
3 Nov 200158.9AppointedBishop of Magangué, Colombia
30 Jul 201269.7ResignedBishop of Magangué, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jorge Leonardo Gómez Serna
Bishop Jorge Leonardo Gómez Serna O.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Magangué

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarinilla

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Magangué.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jul 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018