Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Horacio Olave Velandia

Deceased

Prelate of Tibú, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1944Born
3 Jan 197126.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 198843.5AppointedPrelate of Tibú, Colombia
21 Feb 198843.6Ordained BishopPrelate of Tibú, Colombia
17 Mar 198843.7DiedPrelate of Tibú, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Horacio Olave Velandia
Bishop Horacio Olave Velandia (born , died ) Prelate of Tibú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZapatoca

  • a priest for 17.2 years
  • a bishop for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,914

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018