Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan José Díaz Plata, O.P. †

Deceased

Prelate of Bertrania en el Catatumbo, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1904Born
13 Sep 195348.8AppointedPrelate of Bertrania en el Catatumbo, Colombia
2 Aug 197974.7DiedPrelate of Bertrania en el Catatumbo, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Juan José Díaz Plata
Father Juan José Díaz Plata O.P. (born , died ) Prelate of Bertrania en el Catatumbo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZapatoca

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1976

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast