Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Barrancabermeja

Dioecesis Barrancabermeiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 27 October 1962
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bucaramanga
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 15,000 (5,793 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Residencia Episcopal, Carrera 16 N. 48-19, Barrancabermeja, Santander, Colombia
  • Telephone: (7)622.34.99
  • Fax: 622.48.58

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Río Magdalena
2 April 1928ErectedDiocese of Nueva Pamplona
Diocese of Socorro y San Gil
Territorial Prelature of Río Magdalena (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Barrancabermeja
18 April 1950ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Río Magdalena Vicariate Apostolic of Barrancabermeja
Diocese of Barrancabermeja
27 October 1962ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Barrancabermeja Diocese of Barrancabermeja
29 March 1984Territory LostDiocese of Barrancabermeja
Diocese of Facatativá
Archdiocese of Manizales
Diocese of La Dorada-Guaduas (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Barrancabermeja
195068,00068,000100.0%12125,66621426ap1951
Diocese of Barrancabermeja
1966291,000294,00099.0%3116476,1912613024ap1967
1970317,000321,00098.8%3412466,8911614827ap1971
1976360,000371,00097.0%3511467,8261312528ap1977
1980396,000409,00096.8%3310439,2091210828ap1981
1990385,000444,00086.7%3111429,1661211927ap1991
1999410,000525,00078.1%4114557,454169528ap2000
2000380,000520,00073.1%4413576,6661139128ap2001
2001390,000530,00073.6%4814626,2901148630ap2002
2002380,000530,00071.7%4314576,6661148530ap2003
2003350,000530,00066.0%4710576,140108233ap2004
2004320,000540,00059.3%5010605,333108033ap2005
2006386,000539,00071.6%5312655,9381154734ap2007
2012420,000584,00071.9%5610666,3631103934ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013