Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Prieto Amaya

Deceased

Bishop of Cúcuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1941BornSantafé de Bogotá
14 Aug 196524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Facatativá, Colombia
11 Nov 199352.6AppointedBishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
11 Dec 199352.7Ordained BishopBishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
1 Dec 200867.6AppointedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
7 Feb 200967.8InstalledBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
25 Aug 201069.4DiedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jaime Prieto Amaya:
Bishop Jaime Prieto Amaya (born , died ) Bishop of Cúcuta

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2008
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,243
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015