Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hernando Velásquez Lotero

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Facatativá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1926BornMedellín
29 Oct 195024.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 197145.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Popayán, Colombia
10 Dec 197145.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Garba
13 Feb 197245.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Garba
27 Apr 197346.8AppointedBishop of Facatativá, Colombia
18 May 198558.9ResignedBishop of Facatativá, Colombia
26 Apr 200477.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Facatativá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Hernando Velásquez Lotero:
Bishop Hernando Velásquez Lotero (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Facatativá

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013