Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabio Betancur Tirado

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Manizales


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1938BornArmenia
6 Sep 196425.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 198243.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
24 May 198243.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sereddeli
3 Jul 198243.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sereddeli
29 Mar 198445.4AppointedBishop of La Dorada-Guaduas, Colombia
15 Oct 199658.0AppointedArchbishop of Manizales, Colombia
7 Oct 201071.9ResignedArchbishop of Manizales, Colombia
20 Nov 201173.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Manizales, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Fabio Betancur Tirado:
Archbishop Fabio Betancur Tirado (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manizales

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2010
  • d: CB, 20 Nov 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013