Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal López Trujillo

Deceased

President of the Pontifical Council for the Family

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1935BornVillahermosa
13 Nov 196025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
25 Feb 197135.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Bogotá, Colombia
25 Feb 197135.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Boseta
25 Mar 197135.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Boseta
22 May 197842.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Medellín, Colombia
2 Jun 197943.5SucceededArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
2 Feb 198347.2Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198347.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
8 Nov 199055.0AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
9 Jan 199155.1ResignedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
17 Nov 200166.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
2 Apr 200569.4CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
21 Apr 200569.4ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
19 Apr 200872.4DiedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family

MicroData Summary for Alfonso López Trujillo:
Alfonso Cardinal López Trujillo (born , died ) President of Family

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
  • a cardinal for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015