Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Correa León

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cúcuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1918BornBogotá
26 Oct 194123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
10 Nov 195638.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
10 Nov 195638.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gisipa
25 Feb 195738.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gisipa
22 Jul 195941.1AppointedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
27 Jul 197052.1ResignedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
27 Jul 197052.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Columnata
22 Dec 197052.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Columnata
19 Aug 198062.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Cúcuta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Pablo Correa León:
Bishop Pablo Correa León (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cúcuta

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013