Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio de Brigard Ortiz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia

Titular Archbishop of Dystis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1888Born
28 Oct 191123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
29 Jul 194456.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
29 Jul 194456.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Coracesium
3 Sep 194456.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coracesium
26 Oct 196173.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dystis
6 Mar 198697.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Emilio de Brigard Ortiz
Archbishop Emilio de Brigard Ortiz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChia

  • a priest for 74.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018