Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Roig y Villalba, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Valledupar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1904BornGuadasuar, Spain
17 Dec 192723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Dec 194440.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Goajira, Colombia
15 Dec 194440.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arad
11 Mar 194540.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arad
4 Dec 195248.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Valledupar, Colombia
25 Apr 196964.7AppointedBishop of Valledupar, Colombia
5 Apr 197772.6DiedBishop of Valledupar, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Vicente Roig y Villalba:
Bishop Vicente Roig y Villalba O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Valledupar

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013