Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Luis Gutiérrez Pabón

Bishop Emeritus of Engativá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1937 BornCaqueza
22 Sep 196225.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
13 Feb 198749.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
13 Feb 198749.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Segia
25 Mar 198749.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segia
2 Feb 199860.7AppointedBishop of Chiquinquirá, Colombia
6 Aug 200366.2AppointedBishop of Engativá, Colombia
21 Sep 200366.3InstalledBishop of Engativá, Colombia
26 Jun 201578.1RetiredBishop of Engativá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Héctor Luis Gutiérrez Pabón:
Bishop Héctor Luis Gutiérrez Pabón (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Engativá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Engativá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015