Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Soleibe Arbeláez

Bishop Emeritus of Caldas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1938 BornCartago
21 Sep 196324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cartagena, Colombia
19 Jul 199960.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
19 Jul 199960.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sullectum
8 Sep 199960.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sullectum
6 Dec 200264.0AppointedBishop of Caldas, Colombia
28 Jan 201576.1RetiredBishop of Caldas, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Soleibe Arbeláez:
Bishop José Soleibe Arbeláez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Caldas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caldas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,605
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015