Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Roberto Ospina Leongómez

Bishop of Buga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1947 BornSan Miguel de Sema
29 Nov 197225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
19 Apr 200457.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
19 Apr 200457.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gypsaria
29 May 200457.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gypsaria
10 May 201265.1AppointedBishop of Buga, Colombia
30 Jun 201265.3InstalledBishop of Buga, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Roberto Ospina Leongómez:
Bishop José Roberto Ospina Leongómez (born ) Bishop of Buga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Buga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,602
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 May 2012
  • i: CB, 10 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013