Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Antonio Nieto Súa

Bishop of Engativá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1948 BornPanqueba
30 Nov 197325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
22 Oct 200860.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
22 Oct 200860.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Teglata in Numidia
17 Nov 200860.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teglata in Numidia
2 Feb 201162.3AppointedBishop of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
11 Mar 201162.4InstalledBishop of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
26 Jun 201566.7AppointedBishop of Engativá, Colombia
27 Jul 201566.8InstalledBishop of Engativá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Francisco Antonio Nieto Súa:
Bishop Francisco Antonio Nieto Súa (born ) Bishop of Engativá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Engativá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,987
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2015
  • i: CB, 6 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015