Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San JosÚ del Guaviare

Dioecesis Sancti Iosephi a Guaviare



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 29 October 1999
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Villavicencio
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 42,327 (16,348 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisdelguaviare.org/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Episcopal, Carrera 24 N. 8-91, San Jose, Guaviare, Colombia
  • Telephone: (8)5840.023
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of San JosÚ del Guaviare
19 January 1989ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Mit˙ Vicariate Apostolic of San JosÚ del Guaviare (erected)
Diocese of San JosÚ del Guaviare
29 October 1999ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of San JosÚ del Guaviare Diocese of San JosÚ del Guaviare
3 July 2004Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of San JosÚ del Guaviare (from Bogota)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of San JosÚ del Guaviare
1990110,000120,00091.7%75129,166549ap1991
Diocese of San JosÚ del Guaviare
1999100,000120,00083.3%17175,8823412ap2000
2000100,000140,00071.4%18185,5553412ap2001
2001100,000140,00071.4%18185,5553412ap2002
2002105,000145,00072.4%20205,2503615ap2003
2003103,500115,00090.0%28283,69633415ap2004
2004108,500120,00090.4%23234,7173415ap2005
2010118,000121,00097.5%16167,375221315ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014