Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Belarmino Correa Yepes, M.X.Y. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San José del Guaviare, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1930Born
15 Aug 195727.0Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
30 Oct 196737.2AppointedPrefect of Mitú, Colombia
19 Jan 198958.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
19 Jan 198958.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
8 Apr 198958.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
29 Oct 199969.2AppointedBishop of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
17 Jan 200675.5RetiredBishop of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
20 Mar 202089.6DiedBishop Emeritus of San José del Guaviare, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Belarmino Correa Yepes
Bishop Belarmino Correa Yepes M.X.Y. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San José del Guaviare

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBriceño
Ordained BishopCollége S. José, Guaviare, Vicariate Apostolic of San José del Guaviare
Death PlaceVillavicencio, Archdiocese of Villavicencio

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,572
  • d: CB, 21 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast