Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gustavo Angel Ramírez, M.X.Y. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mitú

Titular Bishop of Vescera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1934BornLa Ceja
7 Sep 195824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
19 Jun 198955.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mitú-Puerto Inírida, Colombia
19 Jun 198955.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vescera
22 Jul 198955.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vescera
17 Sep 200975.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of Mitú, Colombia
23 Feb 201379.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mitú, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Gustavo Angel Ramírez:
Bishop José Gustavo Angel Ramírez M.X.Y. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Mitú

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Sep 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,665
  • d: CB, 25 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 3 Dec 2013