Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Emilio Jaramillo Monsalve, M.X.Y. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arauca, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1916Born
1 Sep 194024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
11 Nov 197054.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Arauca, Colombia
11 Nov 197054.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Strumnitza
10 Jan 197154.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Strumnitza
19 Jul 198468.4AppointedBishop of Arauca, Colombia
2 Oct 198973.6DiedBishop of Arauca, Colombia
8 Sep 2017Beatified

MicroData Summary for Jesús Emilio Jaramillo Monsalve
Bishop Jesús Emilio Jaramillo Monsalve M.X.Y. (born , died ) Bishop of Arauca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Domingo (Antioquia)

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1989, Page 44
  • beat: CB, 18 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jul 2017