Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Suescún Mutis

Bishop of Colombia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1942 Born
19 Nov 196624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
3 May 198643.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
3 May 198643.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Iomnium
13 Jun 198643.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iomnium
20 Nov 199351.0AppointedBishop of Pereira, Colombia
19 Jan 200158.1AppointedBishop of Colombia, Military

MicroData Summary for Fabio Suescún Mutis
Bishop Fabio Suescún Mutis (born ) Bishop of Colombia, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBucaramanga

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Colombia, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,147
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,242
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018