Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Albeiro Cortés Rendón

Auxiliary Bishop of Pereira

Titular Bishop of Fidoloma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1952 BornQuimbaya
8 Dec 197826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pereira, Colombia
14 May 200351.2AppointedBishop of Vélez, Colombia
27 Jun 200351.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vélez, Colombia
17 Jul 200351.4InstalledBishop of Vélez, Colombia
30 Nov 201563.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pereira, Colombia
30 Nov 201563.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Fidoloma

MicroData Summary for Luis Albeiro Cortés Rendón:
Bishop Luis Albeiro Cortés Rendón (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Pereira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pereira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,415
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Nov 2015