Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eduardo Francisco Cardinal Pironio

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Laity

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1920BornNueve de Julio
5 Dec 194323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mercedes, Argentina
24 Mar 196443.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
24 Mar 196443.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caeciri
31 May 196443.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caeciri
19 Apr 197251.3AppointedBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
26 May 197251.4InstalledBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
20 Sep 197554.7AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Religious and Secular Institutes
20 Sep 197554.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thiges
24 May 197655.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197655.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
29 May 197655.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Religious and Secular Institutes
8 Apr 198463.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
22 Jun 198766.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Cosma e Damiano
11 Jul 199574.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto
20 Aug 199675.7RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Laity
5 Feb 199877.1DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Laity

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Francisco Pironio:
Eduardo Francisco Cardinal Pironio (born , died ) President Emeritus of Laity

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
  • a cardinal for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 18 Jul 2015