Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Guirao

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago del Estero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1919BornRafael Obligado
5 Dec 194324.5Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 197051.4AppointedBishop of Orán, Argentina
8 Dec 197051.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orán, Argentina
20 Jan 198161.6AppointedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
20 Mar 198161.8InstalledBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
23 Nov 199475.5RetiredBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
2 Jan 200585.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago del Estero, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Manuel Guirao:
Bishop Manuel Guirao (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago del Estero

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013